Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard de Bonneval

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges, France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1366AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
10 Feb 1371AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
18 Jul 1371AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
1374²Ordained BishopBishop of Bologna, Italy
1378²RemovedBishop of Bologna, Italy
8 Oct 1383AppointedBishop of Nîmes, France
14 Dec 1390AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
1403²DiedBishop of Limoges, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard de Bonneval
Bishop Bernard de Bonneval (died 1403) Bishop of Limoges

  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,211
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 301, and Page 361
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 141, and Page 461
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast