Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Carafa

Deceased

Bishop of Bologna, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1340¹Born
18 Sep 137838.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
18 Sep 137838.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Sep 137838.7AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
22 May 1389³49.3DiedBishop of Bologna, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Carafa
Filippo Cardinal Carafa (born 1340, died ) Bishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Bologna, Diocese of Bologna

  • a cardinal for 10.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 May 2019

Quantcast