Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Regnaud Cardinal de La Porte

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Nov 1294³AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
31 Dec 1316AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
20 Dec 1320AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
20 Dec 1320Elevated to Cardinal
Mar 1321³AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
1 Aug 1321AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
Jul 1325²DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Regnaud de La Porte:
Regnaud Cardinal de La Porte , Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a cardinal for 4.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015