Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Etienne de Bourgueil

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours, France


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Aug 1323AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
4 Sep 1323Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tours, France
7 Mar 1335DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Etienne de Bourgueil
Archbishop Etienne de Bourgueil (died ) Archbishop of Tours

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 503
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,965

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast