Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Élie Cardinal Talleyrand de Périgord

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1301¹Born
10 Oct 132423.7AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
4 Jan 132827.0AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
25 May 133130.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
25 May 133130.3Elevated to Cardinal
4 Nov 134847.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
17 Jan 136463.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Élie Talleyrand de Périgord
Élie Cardinal Talleyrand de Périgord (born 1301, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

EventPlace
Birth PlacePérigord
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Front, Church, Périgueaux, Diocese of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

  • a cardinal for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 25 May 1331
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,206

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 1 Jun 2019

Quantcast