Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Benjamin-Joseph Blanger

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1821Born
21 Dec 184423.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 187352.0SelectedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
25 Jul 187352.3ConfirmedBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
29 Sep 187352.5Ordained BishopBishop of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
3 Aug 188362.3SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
9 Aug 188362.3ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
11 Dec 188766.7DiedBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for François-Benjamin-Joseph Blanger (VIAF: 310754526)
Bishop François-Benjamin-Joseph Blanger (born , died ) Bishop of Limoges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbbeville
Ordained BishopSt. Sulpice, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 293, and Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017