Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnaud de Saint-Astier, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tulle, France


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1317AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
16 Oct 1317Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
6 Jul 1333DiedBishop of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for Arnaud de Saint-Astier
Bishop Arnaud de Saint-Astier O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Tulle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsland, Château, Perigord
Ordained BishopCathedral, Avignon
Death PlaceRocamadour

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 505
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,331
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,717

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 19 Dec 2020

Quantcast