Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bertrand Cardinal de Chanac

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Aug 1374AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
30 May 1382AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
30 May 1382AppointedAdministrator of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
12 Jul 1385AppointedCardinal-Priest
17 Jul 1385ResignedAdministrator of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
9 Mar 1386AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
21 May 1401DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de Chanac
Bertrand Cardinal de Chanac (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAllassac, Diocese of Tulle, France
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Dominicans, Church, Avignon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 91, and Page 276
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast