Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrand de Maumont

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tulle, France


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Nov 1394AppointedBishop of Mirepoix, France
9 Feb 1405AppointedBishop of Lavaur, France
10 Mar 1408AppointedBishop of Béziers, France
12 Jan 1422AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
1425¹ResignedBishop of Tulle, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de Maumont
Bishop Bertrand de Maumont , Bishop Emeritus of Tulle

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 505, and Page 138
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 518, and Page 344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 Jun 2020

Quantcast