Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geoffroy de Pompadour

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jun 1409Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
17 Feb 1410AppointedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
17 Oct 1420AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
1445¹DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Geoffroy de Pompadour
Bishop Geoffroy de Pompadour (died 1445) Bishop of Carcassonne

  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 406, and Page 166
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,927
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast