Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Le Neveu

Deceased

Bishop of Albi, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jan 1408SelectedBishop of Lavaur, France
21 Oct 1409ConfirmedBishop of Lavaur, France
5 Sep 1410AppointedBishop of Albi, France
1434¹DiedBishop of Albi, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Le Neveu
Bishop Pierre Le Neveu (died 1434) Bishop of Albi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 81, and Page 518

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Aug 2021

Quantcast