Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Denis du Moulin

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Mar 1423AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
10 Jun 1439AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Paris, France
10 Jun 1439AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
15 Sep 1447DiedBishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Denis du Moulin
Patriarch Denis du Moulin (died ) Bishop of Paris

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 488
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 213, and Page 89
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,203
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,836

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Aug 2021

Quantcast