Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raoul de Coucy

Deceased

Bishop of Noyon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Aug 1387AppointedBishop of Metz, France
20 Mar 1415AppointedBishop of Noyon, France
17 Mar 1425DiedBishop of Noyon, France

MicroData Summary for Raoul de Coucy
Bishop Raoul de Coucy (died ) Bishop of Noyon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 373, and Page 338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast