Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Lefévre

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Aug 1369AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
30 May 1371AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
30 May 1371Elevated to Cardinal
6 Mar 1372DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello

MicroData Summary for Jean Lefévre
Jean Cardinal Lefévre (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteau, Maumont, Diocese of Tulle, France
Death PlaceAvignon

  • a cardinal for .7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 May 1371
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 505

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 8 Apr 2020

Quantcast