Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrand de Cosnac (Maumont)

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers, France


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1371AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
9 Jan 1376AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France
12 Aug 1385DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de Cosnac (Maumont)
Bishop Bertrand de Cosnac (Maumont) (died ) Bishop of Poitiers

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 505, and Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Feb 2021

Quantcast