Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugues Combarel

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers, France


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Nov 1419AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
12 Jan 1422AppointedBishop of Béziers, France
14 Feb 1424AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Hugues Combarel
Bishop Hugues Combarel , Bishop of Poitiers

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 505, and Page 138
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 8 Apr 2020

Quantcast