Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Rol

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Angoulême, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1926Born
28 Feb 195326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tulle, France
27 Feb 197346.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Angoulême, France
27 Feb 197346.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gabii
1 May 197346.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gabii
1 Jul 197549.1SucceededBishop of Angoulême, France
22 Dec 199367.5ResignedBishop of Angoulême, France
13 Apr 201790.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Angoulême, France

MicroData Summary for Georges Rol
Bishop Georges Rol (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Angoulême

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThiviers
Death PlaceIsle d’Espagnac, Diocese of Angoulême

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 13 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017