Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques André Blaquart

Bishop of Orléans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1951 BornRoumazières
23 May 198230.4Ordained PriestPriest of Angoulême, France
28 Jun 200654.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
28 Jun 200654.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ypres
17 Sep 200654.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ypres
27 Jul 201058.6AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
17 Oct 201058.8InstalledBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques André Blaquart:
Bishop Jacques André Blaquart (born ) Bishop of Orléans

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orléans.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2006
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,245
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013