Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Joseph Adhémar de Monteil de Grignan

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1650BornValentinen
1674¹23.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Sep 168030.2SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
28 Apr 168130.9ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
2 May 168130.9SelectedBishop of Carcassonne, France
22 Sep 168131.3ConfirmedBishop of Carcassonne, France
21 Dec 168131.5Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
1 Mar 172271.7DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Joseph Adhémar de Monteil de Grignan:
Bishop Louis-Joseph Adhémar de Monteil de Grignan (born , died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 143, and Page 191
  • b: La France Pontificale, Volume 14, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015