Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Moussy

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Feb 1321AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
10 May 1321Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
7 Oct 1325AppointedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
16 Aug 1326AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
30 Jan 1330AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
1338DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

Note(s): ⁴ Guess

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Moussy:
Bishop Pierre de Moussy Bishop of Carcassonne

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 334, and Page 533
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,855
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 124, and Page 166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013