Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Félix Beuvain de Beauséjour

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1839BornVésoul
6 Jan 186323.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 May 190262.4SelectedBishop of Carcassonne, France
9 Jun 190262.5ConfirmedBishop of Carcassonne, France
20 Mar 190464.3Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
5 Apr 193090.3DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Félix Beuvain de Beauséjour:
Bishop Paul-Félix Beuvain de Beauséjour (born , died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

  • a priest for 67.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 181
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013