Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis Humbrecht

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1853Born
2 Sep 187724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
1 Sep 191158.0AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France
28 Oct 191158.1Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
14 Sep 191865.0AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
28 Jun 192773.8DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Humbrecht
Archbishop Louis Humbrecht (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuéberschwihr

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 87
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018