Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christophe de L’Estang

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560²Born
28 Nov 158020.9AppointedBishop of Lodève, France
1581¹21.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lodève, France
5 Jun 158121.4InstalledBishop of Lodève, France
5 Sep 159434.6AppointedBishop of Alet, France
26 May 160343.4AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
24 Sep 160343.7InstalledBishop of Carcassonne, France
11 Aug 162161.6DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christophe de L’Estang
Bishop Christophe de L’Estang (born 1560, died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrive
Death PlaceCarcassonne, Diocese of Carcassonne

  • a bishop for 40.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 134, and Page 181
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 227, and Page 191
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018