Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geoffrey de Basillac

Deceased

Bishop of Rieux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Feb 1456AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
Jun 1456²ResignedBishop-Elect of Carcassonne, France
30 Apr 1462SelectedBishop of Rieux, France
16 May 1462ConfirmedBishop of Rieux, France
Mar 1480³DiedBishop of Rieux, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Geoffrey de Basillac
Bishop Geoffrey de Basillac (died Mar 1480) Bishop of Rieux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 223, and Page 118
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1462, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast