Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre d’Auxillon

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Dec 1497AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
1498¹Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
19 Jan 1504AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
24 Sep 1512DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre d’Auxillon
Bishop Pierre d’Auxillon (died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNarbonne, Archdiocese of Narbonne

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 152
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 118
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,133
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,498, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast