Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre d’Abzac

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne


Events

DateEventTitle
5 May 1480AppointedBishop of Rieux, France
1 Jun 1487AppointedBishop of Lectoure, France
21 Apr 1494AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
23 May 1502DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre d’Abzac:
Archbishop Pierre d’Abzac (died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 199, and Page 174
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013