Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Bilhères de Lagraulas, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lombez, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina

Bishop of Condom

Bishop of Viviers (Aps)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1434¹Born
5 Jul 147339.5AppointedBishop of Lombez, France
2 Dec 149157.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saintes, France
Aug 1492³58.5ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Saintes, France
20 Sep 149359.7Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 149359.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
26 Oct 149662.8AppointedBishop of Condom, France
14 Feb 149864.1AppointedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
4 Aug 149965.5ResignedBishop of Lombez, France
6 Aug 149965.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Lombez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Bilhères de Lagraulas (VIAF: 314925570)
Jean Cardinal Bilhères de Lagraulas O.S.B. (born 1434, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lombez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGascony
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Petronila Chapel, Vatican Basilica, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 5.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1493
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 133, and Page 179
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 271, and Page 270
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1473, Number 29*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Nov 2018

Quantcast