Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antoine Cardinal du Prat

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens, France

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

Administrator of Albi

Administrator of Meaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1463Born
1517²53.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 152562.1AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
21 Nov 152764.8Elevated to Cardinal
27 Apr 152865.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
23 Dec 152865.9AppointedAdministrator of Albi, France
20 Feb 153471.0AppointedAdministrator of Meaux, France
9 Jul 153572.4DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine du Prat
Antoine Cardinal du Prat (born , died ) Archbishop of Sens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIssoire

  • a priest for 18.5 years
  • a cardinal for 7.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Nov 1527
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 298, and Page 240
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 101
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,525, Number 4*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast