Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre Bravard

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coutances (-Avranches), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1811Born
20 Dec 183423.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Aug 186251.5SelectedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
25 Sep 186251.5ConfirmedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
28 Oct 186251.6Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
27 Nov 1875³64.7ResignedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
13 Aug 187665.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Coutances (-Avranches), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Bravard (VIAF: 61536727)
Bishop Jean-Pierre Bravard (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coutances (-Avranches)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUsson-en-Forez, Archdiocese of Lyon
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sens, Archdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre)

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 222
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017