Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guy de Roye

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France


Events

DateEventTitle
28 May 1375AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
27 May 1381AppointedBishop of Dol, France
17 Oct 1382AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
8 Oct 1383AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Castres, France
4 Aug 1385AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
27 May 1390AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
8 Jun 1409DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Guy de Roye
Archbishop Guy de Roye (died ) Archbishop of Reims

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 225, and Page 503
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 531, and Page 173
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 448, and Page 419

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 May 2019

Quantcast