Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guilleume de Dormans

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens, France


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Feb 1379AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
17 Oct 1390AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
25 Oct 1415DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

MicroData Summary for Guilleume de Dormans
Archbishop Guilleume de Dormans (died ) Archbishop of Sens

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 448, and Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast