Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Bertrand

Deceased

Administrator of Sens, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1482²Born
16 Dec 155573.9AppointedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
16 Jun 155674.4ResignedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
15 Mar 155775.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Jul 155775.5AppointedAdministrator of Sens, France
9 Aug 155775.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
16 Jan 156078.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
13 Mar 156078.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
30 Apr 156078.3Ordained BishopBishop
4 Dec 156078.9DiedAdministrator of Sens, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Jean Bertrand (VIAF: 207208824)
Jean Cardinal Bertrand (born 1482, died ) Administrator of Sens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulouse, Archdiocese of Toulouse
Ordained BishopVirgin Mary, Chapel, Loreto, Diocese of Recanati, Italy
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Stefano, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

  • a bishop for .5 years
  • a cardinal for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1557
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 298
  • ob/c2: CB, 19 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018