Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alain Cardinal de CoŽtivy

Deceased

Bishop of Avignon

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1407BornCoŽt-Lestrťmeur
30 Oct 143730.1AppointedBishop of Avignon, France
2 Oct 144235.1AppointedAdministrator of Uzťs, France
Jun 1445³37.7ResignedAdministrator of Uzťs, France
20 Dec 144841.3Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jan 144941.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
1 Apr 145446.6AppointedAdministrator of NÓmes, France
18 Jun 145648.8AppointedAdministrator of Dol, France
7 Jan 146052.3ResignedAdministrator of Dol, France
19 Nov 146053.2ResignedAdministrator of NÓmes, France
7 Jan 146153.3AppointedAdministrator of Saintes, France
8 Apr 146254.6ResignedAdministrator of Saintes, France
7 Jun 146557.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
3 Jan 146658.3InstalledCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
11 Dec 147265.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
3 May 147466.7DiedBishop of Avignon, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alain de CoŽtivy:
Alain Cardinal de CoŽtivy (born , died ) Bishop of Avignon

  • a cardinal for 25.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1448

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015