Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Étienne Blosset de Carrouges

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lisieux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Sep 1481AppointedBishop of Nîmes, France
12 Jul 1482AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
13 Jun 1505ResignedBishop of Lisieux, France
31 Oct 1505DiedBishop Emeritus of Lisieux, France

MicroData Summary for Étienne Blosset de Carrouges
Bishop Étienne Blosset de Carrouges (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lisieux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 201, and Page 176
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1481, Number 32*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Dec 2018

Quantcast