Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie-Madeleine Cortois de Baloré

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nîmes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1736BornDijon
5 Apr 177639.9SelectedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
20 May 177640.0ConfirmedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
30 Jun 177640.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alès (Alais), France
23 Feb 178447.7SelectedBishop of Nîmes, France
20 Jun 178448.1ResignedBishop of Alès (Alais), France
25 Jun 178448.1ConfirmedBishop of Nîmes, France
30 Sep 180165.3ResignedBishop of Nîmes, France
19 Oct 181276.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Nîmes, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie-Madeleine Cortois de Baloré:
Bishop Pierre-Marie-Madeleine Cortois de Baloré (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nîmes

  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 74, and Page 305
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 24 Dec 2015