Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Cardinal Brišonnet

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne, France

Administrator of Nţmes

Note/Previous Titular See: (excommunicated from 1511 to 1513)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1445¹Born
2 Oct 149348.7AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
16 Jan 149550.0Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jan 149550.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
26 Oct 149651.8AppointedAdministrator of Nţmes, France
1497²52.0AppointedAdministrator of Toulon, France
24 Aug 149752.6AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
1501²56.0ResignedAdministrator of Toulon, France
15 Jul 150762.5AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
16 Sep 150762.7ResignedArchbishop of Reims, France
17 Sep 150762.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
22 Sep 150863.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
3 Jun 150964.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
24 Oct 151166.8RemovedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
16 Aug 151469.6ResignedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
14 Dec 151469.9DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Brišonnet (VIAF: 65179200)
Guillaume Cardinal Brišonnet (born 1445, died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTours, Archdiocese of Tours
Death PlaceNarbonne, Archdiocese of Narbonne
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Just, Cathedral, Narbonne, Archdiocese of Narbonne

  • a cardinal for 19.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1495
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 223, and Page 183
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 201
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,493, Number 38*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast