Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Charles Arnal du Curel

Deceased

Bishop of Monaco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1858Born
21 Dec 188931.4Ordained PriestPriest of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France
2 Oct 190345.2AppointedBishop of Monaco
8 Nov 190345.3Ordained BishopBishop of Monaco
6 Jun 191556.9DiedBishop of Monaco

MicroData Summary for Jean-Charles Arnal du Curel
Bishop Jean-Charles Arnal du Curel (born , died ) Bishop of Monaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Vigan, France

  • a priest for 25.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017