Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel de Beauvau de Rivarennes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nantes


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Feb 1636AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
27 Apr 1636Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
1667¹ResignedBishop of Nantes, France
9 Jan 1668DiedBishop Emeritus of Nantes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de Beauvau de Rivarennes:
Bishop Gabriel de Beauvau de Rivarennes (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nantes

  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 15 Mar 2015