Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Balthazar de Budos

Deceased

Bishop of Agde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594¹BornPortes
3 Oct 161622.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Castres, France
3 Oct 161622.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
15 Aug 161723.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
30 Aug 162733.6AppointedBishop of Agde, France
24 Jun 162935.4DiedBishop of Agde, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Balthazar de Budos:
Bishop Balthazar de Budos (born 1594, died ) Bishop of Agde

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 140, and Page 72
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015