Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri d’Escoubleau de Sourdis

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1593Born
18 May 161623.2AppointedBishop of Maillezais, France
19 Mar 162330.0Ordained BishopBishop of Maillezais, France
16 Jul 162936.4AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
18 Jun 164552.3DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

MicroData Summary for Henri d’Escoubleau de Sourdis (VIAF: 100216481)
Archbishop Henri d’Escoubleau de Sourdis (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâtillon-sur-Sèvre

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 123, and Page 229
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018