Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Balzac (Balsac)

Deceased

Bishop of Noyon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Sep 1597AppointedBishop of Noyon, France
8 Feb 1598Ordained BishopBishop of Noyon, France
9 Nov 1625DiedBishop of Noyon, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Balzac (Balsac)
Bishop Charles de Balzac (Balsac) (died ) Bishop of Noyon

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS.Germain des Près, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceChezy sur Marne, Aisne

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 262
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,347
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018