Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Maria de Liguori (Liguoro), C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1679BornNapoli
169515.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
4 Jun 170223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
10 Jan 171838.9AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
16 Jan 171838.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
8 Feb 173051.0AppointedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
May 175172.2DiedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Maria de Liguori (Liguoro):
Bishop Domenico Maria de Liguori (Liguoro) C.R. (born ) Bishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni)

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1742
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,466

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013