Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Martelli

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Firenze {Florence}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1678BornFlorence
19 Jul 171637.8Ordained PriestPriest of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
2 Mar 172243.4AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
22 Mar 172243.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
10 Feb 174061.4ResignedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
22 May 174162.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Martelli:
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Martelli (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 24.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013