Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Labanchi

Deceased

Bishop of Oria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1677Born
17 May 170427.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 172043.2AppointedBishop of Oria, Italy
22 Sep 172043.6Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
15 Jul 174669.4DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Labanchi
Bishop Giambattista Labanchi (born , died ) Bishop of Oria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarathe

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 400
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018