Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Giovanni Battista Puccini

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1656³BornCastro S. Jean
28 Sep 168124.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 171659.0AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
26 Jan 171659.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
Jun 1726³69.4DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Giovanni Battista Puccini:
Bishop Pietro Giovanni Battista Puccini (born , died Jun 1726) Bishop of Cortona

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 174
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 4 Aug 2015