Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Vincenzo Platamone, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1666³BornCamerata
26 Mar 168923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Mar 172256.1AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
6 Apr 172256.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
13 Feb 173367.0DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Vincenzo Platamone:
Bishop Pietro Vincenzo Platamone O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Lipari

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1731
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 245
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015