Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NicolÚ Drasich

Deceased

Bishop of Ossero (Osor)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1670³BornSplit
18 Sep 169424.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 171645.9AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
12 Jul 171645.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
16 Sep 172050.1AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
Dec 1737³67.3DiedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Drasich:
Bishop NicolÚ Drasich (born , died Dec 1737) Bishop of Ossero (Osor)

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 107, and Page 292
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1716, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 4 Aug 2015