Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Migliaccio

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1658BornMontemaggiore
18 May 169335.1AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
24 May 169335.1Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
24 Nov 169840.6AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
25 Mar 172970.9DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Migliaccio:
Archbishop Giuseppe Migliaccio (born , died ) Archbishop of Messina

  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 266, and Page 303
  • c34: CB, 14 Mar 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015