Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prudentius (Giovanni Filippo) Patti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1689Born
12 Mar 171223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Apr 175667.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Isauria
4 Jul 175667.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Isauria
6 Nov 175667.7DiedTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Isauria

MicroData Summary for Prudentius (Giovanni Filippo) Patti
Bishop Prudentius (Giovanni Filippo) Patti O.S.B. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Isauria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Margherita, Archdiocese of Messina, Italy
Ordained PriestSant'Anna, Monastery, Messina, Archdiocese of Messina, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Teresa ai Gentilmeni, Monastery, Messina, Archdiocese of Messina, Italy
Death PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Placido il Vecchio, Monastery, Messina, Archdiocese of Messina, Italy

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 196
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 16
  • ob/c12/loc: AT, 14 Feb 2021
  • d: AT, 16 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Feb 2021

Quantcast