Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Miceli

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1676BornMessina
6 Mar 170023.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Feb 172952.2AppointedBishop of Amathus in Palaestina
10 Jul 172952.6Ordained BishopBishop of Amathus in Palaestina
11 Mar 174366.3AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
2 Jan 175376.1DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Miceli:
Bishop Francesco Maria Miceli (born , died ) Bishop of Lipari

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1746
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 81
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,690

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013